RI S0917 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals a provision of the workers' compensation law that provides that for injuries on and after July 1, 2023, "material hindrance" includes only compensable injuries causing a greater than sixty-five percent (65%) degree of functional impairment.
Title
Workers' Compensation--benefits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Workers' compensation benefits (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Workers' compensation benefits (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-07-19 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-29 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2017-06-29 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/29/2017) |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/28/2017) |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/21/2017) |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Committee recommended indefinite postponement |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/31/2017) |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |