RI S0915 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-29 - Senate voted to recommit to Senate Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-29 - Senate voted to recommit to Senate Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that portions of the city of Central Falls would be included within the Pawtucket Downtown Redevelopment Project.
Title
City Of Pawtucket Downtown Redevelopment Project
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-29 | Senate | Senate voted to recommit to Senate Finance |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/29/2021) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2021) |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/08/2021) |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0915.pdf |