RI S0911 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-26 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-26 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the tax exemption for real property held by the Burrillville Land Trust to two million dollars ($2,000,000).
Title
Relating To The Burrillville Land Trust
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-28 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-26 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-07-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-28 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2017-06-28 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/28/2017) |
2017-06-27 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-06-24 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-07 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/06/2017) |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/30/2017) |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |