RI S0908 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the commuter transportation benefit act. Employers with twenty (20) or more employees would provide a pre-tax transportation fringe benefit program or provide transportation to the employees.
Title
Establishing The "commuter Transportation Benefits Act"
Sponsors
Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Harold Metts [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] |
Sen. Ana Quezada [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/12/2019) |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0908.pdf |