RI S0905 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Renames the College of Pharmacy building on Greenhouse Road at the University of Rhode Island in Kingston, as "Paramaz Avedisian '54 Hall."
Title
Permanent Joint Committee On Naming All New Buildings, Bridges, Edifices And Other State Constructions
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] |
Sen. Dennis Algiere [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - The "paramaz avedisian '54 hall" (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - The "paramaz avedisian '54 hall" (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-27 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2017-06-24 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/27/2017) |
2017-05-25 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/24/2017) |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2017) |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |