RI S0903 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for minimum qualifications for court constable to include education, military, or law enforcement experience and drug and psychological screening.
Title
Procedure Generally -- Writs, Summons And Process
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] |
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - House - Passage As Amended (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-06 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-07-01 | House | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2021-06-29 | House | Placed on House Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-06-28 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2021-06-25 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2021) |
2021-06-24 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/22/2021) |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/17/2021) |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/24/2021) |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |