RI S0895 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the East Providence City Council to issue a Class B liquor license for a retail establishment, located at 332 Bullock Point Avenue.
Title
Retail Licenses
Sponsors
Sen. Cynthia Mendes [D] | Sen. Samuel Bell [D] | Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] |
Sen. Tiara Mack [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-15 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-25 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-15 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2021-06-12 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/15/2021) |
2021-06-10 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-06-08 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/10/2021) |
2021-05-12 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Recommended for Immediate Consideration |