RI S0892 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits the Cumberland Town Council to establish limits on the number of students from the Cumberland school district who may enroll in any charter public school, Davies, and the Met Center.
Title
The Education Equity And Property Tax Relief Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/30/2017) |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0892.pdf |