RI S0889 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases various property tax exemptions available in the town of Warren.
Title
Property Subject To Taxation--town Of Warren
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Town of warren (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Town of warren (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-29 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-21 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2017-06-16 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/21/2017) |
2017-06-07 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-06-02 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/07/2017) |
2017-05-31 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/30/2017) |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/23/2017) |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |