RI S0888 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-14 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits noncompetition agreements except for noncompetition agreements between a seller and buyer of a business.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rhode Island Noncompetition Agreement Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-14 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-14SenateSenate read and passed
2023-06-13SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/14/2023)
2023-06-13SenateCommittee recommends passage
2023-06-10SenateScheduled for consideration (06/13/2023)
2023-05-11SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-05-05SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/11/2023)
2023-03-30SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback