RI S0883 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the college crusade of Rhode Island, a 501(c)(3) nonprofit organization registered with the Rhode Island secretary of state, as the entity that will administer and operate all program services and manage scholarship resources.
Title
The Rhode Island Children's Crusade For Higher Education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-28 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - For higher education (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - For higher education (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-07-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-28 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2017-06-28 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/28/2017) |
2017-06-27 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-06-24 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-02 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/01/2017) |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/24/2017) |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2017) |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |