RI S0881 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Includes East Providence in the Northern Rhode Island regional tourism district.
Title
Tourism And Development
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-28 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-28 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2021-06-26 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/28/2021) |
2021-06-17 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-06-15 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/17/2021) |
2021-06-02 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/01/2021) |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/27/2021) |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |