RI S0877 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Promotes a more efficient way to enforce tax liens on mobile and manufactured homes in the town of Coventry by allowing the town to enforce the lien in the same manner as used to collect real estate taxes.
Title
Collection Of Taxes Generally--coventry
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-14 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-14 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/14/2023) |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2023-06-09 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/13/2023) |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2023) |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Meeting postponed (04/20/2023) |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |