RI S0871 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the foundation level of support required of municipalities, excluding funds received by the school district from the Elementary and Secondary School Emergency Relief Fund, in connection with relief due to the COVID-19 pandemic.
Title
School Funding
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/08/2021) |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0871.pdf |