RI S0868 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the council on elementary/secondary education to implement assessment/evaluation systems for teachers/administrators.
Title
Training And Evaluation - Evaluation Requirements
Sponsors
Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] |
Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-25 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/25/2019) |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/19/2019) |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/12/2019) |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/05/2019) |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Meeting postponed (05/29/2019) |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/15/2019) |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |