RI S0865 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-30 - Meeting postponed (07/01/2021)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-30 - Meeting postponed (07/01/2021)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the law enforcement officers' bill of rights to provide greater accountability in the disciplinary process over law enforcement.
Title
Law Enforcement Officers' Bill Of Rights
Sponsors
Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] | Sen. Meghan Kallman [D] |
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Jonathon Acosta [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Meeting postponed (07/01/2021) |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/10/2021) |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0865.pdf |