RI S0862 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts urban and small farmers from sales taxes, real, tangible and personal property taxes and income taxes. This act would also define urban and small farmers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property Subject To Taxation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-09SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-05-05SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2023)
2023-03-30SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Finance

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback