RI S0859 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Criminal Offenses -- Gun Control And Safe Firearms Act (would Impose Restrictions On The Manufacture, Transfer And Possession Of Certain Semiautomatic Assault Weapons. It Would Ban Large Capacity Ammunition Feed Devices.)
Title
An Act Relating To Criminal Offenses -- Gun Control And Safe Firearms Act (would Impose Restrictions On The Manufacture, Transfer And Possession Of Certain Semiautomatic Assault Weapons. It Would Ban Large Capacity Ammunition Feed Devices.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2013) |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/SenateText13/S0859.pdf |