RI S0852 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Creates an eighteen (18) member special commission on reapportionment whose purpose is to draft and to report to the general assembly to reapportion the districts of the general assembly and the state's United States Congressional districts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing A Reapportionment Commission

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-23 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-06SenateSigned by Governor
2021-06-30SenateTransmitted to Governor
2021-06-23HouseHouse passed Sub A in concurrence
2021-06-21HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/23/2021)
2021-06-14HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
2021-06-11HouseScheduled for consideration (06/14/2021)
2021-06-10HouseReferred to House State Government & Elections
2021-06-08SenateSenate passed Sub A
2021-06-04SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/08/2021)
2021-06-03SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2021-06-02SenateProposed Substitute
2021-05-28SenateScheduled for consideration (06/03/2021)
2021-05-06SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-04-30SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/06/2021)
2021-04-28SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback