RI S0851 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For purposes of teachers' retirement benefits, amends the definition of "former spouse divorced" to include someone who was married to a deceased member for 10+ years and the deceased member was required by court order to contribute support post-divorce.
Title
Teachers' Retirement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/24/2021) |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/22/2021) |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/03/2021) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |