RI S0850 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Names the fishing pier at Rocky Point state park in Warwick after the former department of environmental management deputy director, Larry Mouradjian.
Title
Permanent Joint Committee On Naming All New Buildings, Bridges, Edifices And Other State Constructions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-08 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2021-06-04 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/08/2021) |
2021-05-24 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-05-20 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/24/2021) |
2021-05-12 | House | Referred to House Special Legislation |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/11/2021) |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/05/2021) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |