RI S0850 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the I-195 commission to conduct training for new commission members which would include training in ethics. It makes the commission subject to the open meetings acts, the access to public records acts and their exemptions.
Title
The I-195 Redevelopment Act Of 2011
Sponsors
Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - The i-195 redevelopment act (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - The i-195 redevelopment act (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-05 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-27 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2017-06-24 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-08 | House | Committee transferred to House Judiciary |
2017-06-01 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/31/2017) |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/24/2017) |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Rules, Government Ethics and Oversight |