RI S0844 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-20 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-20 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Motor And Other Vehicles - Registration Of Vehicles (would Authorize The Issuance Of A Special "general Magistrate Emeritus" Registration Plate To General Magistrate John J. O'brien.)
Title
An Act Relating To Motor And Other Vehicles - Registration Of Vehicles (would Authorize The Issuance Of A Special "general Magistrate Emeritus" Registration Plate To General Magistrate John J. O'brien.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-20 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2013-07-12 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-02 | Senate | House passed in concurrence |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (07/02/2013) |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/01/2013) |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (07/01/2013) |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/SenateText13/S0844.pdf |