RI S0838 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on April 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes the requirement, that retail businesses that promote themselves using games of chance, have to register those games of chance with the secretary of state and pay a one hundred fifty dollar ($150) filing fee.
Title
Games Of Chance -- Filing Requirements
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] | Sen. Roger Picard [D] | Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] |
Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/05/2021) |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0838.pdf |