RI S0834 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates the marital sexual assault exception when a victim is incapacitated, disabled, or helpless.
Title
Sexual Assault
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-23 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-22 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2021-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/22/2021) |
2021-06-18 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-06-16 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2021) |
2021-06-16 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/15/2021) |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/08/2021) |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/13/2021) |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |