RI S0832 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Validates certain conveyancing defects in various instruments executed by or affecting grantors, grantees, business entities, powers of attorney, probate fiduciaries, mortgage discharges and foreclosures or certain clerical defects.
Title
Form And Effect Of Conveyances
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] |
Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/01/2017) |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0832.pdf |