RI S0828 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the time period that schools have to commence construction to correct health and safety deficiencies in order to qualify for increased school housing aid.
Title
Foundation Level School Support
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-11 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/11/2021) |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0828.pdf |