RI S0827 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Raises minimum wage on January 1, 2026 and each January 1 thereafter, by the percentage increase in the CPI-U, as published by the US Dept. of Labor Statistics, as of August of the previous year over the level as of August of the year preceding that year.
Title
Minimum Wages
Sponsors
Sen. Tiara Mack [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-26 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2023) |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/SenateText23/S0827.pdf |