RI S0826 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-29 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-29 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enacts the Rhode Island Limited Partnership Act to govern the law of limited partnerships in this state and repeal chapter 12 of title 7 entitled "Limited Partnerships". Effective 1/1/2022.
Title
Uniform Limited Partnership Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-29 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/29/2021) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2021) |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/29/2021) |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |