RI S0825 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows state employees the ability to make an after tax contribution to a qualified Roth contribution program as a part of a deferred compensation plan.
Title
Deferred Compensation Plans
Sponsors
Sen. Melissa Murray [D] | Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] | Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] |
Sen. Walter Felag [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2019) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0825.pdf |