RI S0819 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires real estate appraisers to include solar panels in the appraisal of any real estate along with the past 24 months of invoicing for net metering to determine any average income or balance due, except as prohibited under federal law or regulation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Real Estate Appraiser Certification Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-27SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-04-19SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2023)
2023-04-17SenateMeeting postponed (04/20/2023)
2023-04-14SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2023-03-23SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback