RI S0818 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires preparation of an annual summary report of all findings documenting all reports of suspected and/or verified violations of this chapter.
Title
Department Of Children, Youth And Families--foster Parents' Bill Of Rights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-30 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/30/2023) |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/SenateText23/S0818.pdf |