RI S0813 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows employers to make voluntary contributions to their unemployment account, in order to lower their unemployment insurance tax rate for the following calendar year.
Title
Employment Security - Voluntary Contributions
Sponsors
Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Dennis Algiere [R] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Roger Picard [D] |
Sen. Marc Cote [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-24 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2015-07-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2015-06-24 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2015-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/24/2015) |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2015) |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2015-06-19 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/23/2015) |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Committee heard and continued |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/12/2015) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |