RI S0812 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Includes fentanyl analogs and synthetic opioids into Schedule I and Schedule II of the list of uniform controlled substances.
Title
Uniform Controlled Substances Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-21 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2017-06-16 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/21/2017) |
2017-06-13 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-06-09 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/13/2017) |
2017-06-08 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/07/2017) |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2017) |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2017) |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |