RI S0810 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Creating A Special Commission To Be Known As "the Rhode Island Semiquincentennial (ri 250th) Commission"
Title
Joint Resolution Creating A Special Commission To Be Known As "the Rhode Island Semiquincentennial (ri 250th) Commission"
Sponsors
Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-08 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2021-06-04 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/08/2021) |
2021-06-01 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-05-28 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/01/2021) |
2021-04-28 | House | Referred to House State Government & Elections |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/27/2021) |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/14/2021) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |