RI S0810 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-25 - Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-25 - Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Rhode Island cooperative water authority. The authority would have the power to acquire, lease, manage, sell, and otherwise deal with land and water supply systems and authorized to issue bonds and notes in furtherance of its mission.
Title
The Rhode Island Cooperative Water Authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Committee recommended indefinite postponement |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/25/2017) |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |