RI S0799 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits insurer from denying application/exclude/limit coverage under any life insurance policy based solely on prescription to carry or possess naloxone.
Title
Life Insurance Policies And Reserves
Sponsors
Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-24 - House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Life insurance policies approval of amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Life insurance policies approval of amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-24 | House | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2019-06-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/24/2019) |
2019-06-19 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2019-06-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/19/2019) |
2019-06-14 | House | Committee transferred to House H.E.W. |
2019-05-31 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/30/2019) |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2019) |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/30/2019) |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |