RI S0793 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 19 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Transmitted to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Adroit Software Inc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Adroit Software Inc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-11SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-06-19HouseHouse passed in concurrence
2019-06-14HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/19/2019)
2019-04-30HouseCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2019-04-26HouseScheduled for consideration (04/30/2019)
2019-04-23HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-04-15HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/23/2019)
2019-04-10HouseReferred to House Corporations
2019-04-09SenateSenate read and passed
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (04/09/2019)

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback