RI S0788 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prevents third-party delivery service from using the likeness, registered trademark, or any intellectual property belonging to the merchant to falsely suggest sponsorship or endorsement by, or affiliation with the merchant without the merchant’s consent.
Title
General Regulatory Provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] | Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] |
Sen. Roger Picard [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-30 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2021-06-28 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/30/2021) |
2021-06-28 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-06-25 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2021) |
2021-06-25 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/24/2021) |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/22/2021) |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/27/2021) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |