RI S0788 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-14 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-14 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopts a portion of the National Association of Insurance Commissioners (NAIC) model act with respect to receiverships, specifically with regards to how derivative contracts are treated in cases of insurance receiverships.
Title
Insurers' Rehabilitation And Liquidation Act -- Insurance Receivership Model Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2019) |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/06/2019) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/30/2019) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |