RI S0781 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-18 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adjusts the state's monthly share of Supplemental Security Income to equal the federal Supplemental Security Income benefit in January of that calendar year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Assistance Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-18SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-05-12SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/18/2023)
2023-03-23SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Finance

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback