RI S0781 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Reduces the number of infractions for a person to be considered a "toll violator" from twenty (20) to ten (10). The act also reduces the number of infractions for a person to be considered a "toll evader" from one hundred (100) to twenty (20).
Title
Rhode Island Turnpike And Bridge Authority
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] |
Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-20 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2019) |
2019-06-18 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-15 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2019) |
2019-06-07 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/06/2019) |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/30/2019) |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2019) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |