RI S0778 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires baby changing tables in publicly accessible restrooms in existing and new state and municipal buildings, including state house and that accommodations are equally available regardless of gender for which restroom is designed.
Title
State Building Code
Sponsors
Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] | Sen. Jonathon Acosta [D] | Sen. Cynthia Mendes [D] | Sen. Tiara Mack [D] |
Sen. Alana DiMario [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Sandra Cano [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-14 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/14/2021) |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0778.pdf |