RI S0778 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes an assault or battery upon a dwarf resulting in bodily injury a felony and would be punishable by up to three (3) years imprisonment and an assault resulting in serious bodily injury punishable by to twenty (20) years imprisonment.
Title
Relating To Criminal Offenses-assaults
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/08/2017) |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Meeting postponed (06/01/2017) |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0778.pdf |