RI S0775 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-24 - Meeting postponed (06/24/2019)
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-24 - Meeting postponed (06/24/2019)
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits clinical laboratories as defined in ยง 23-16.2-2(2) to conduct its own analysis of specimens for the detection of HIV/AIDS instead of sending the specimens to the department of health.
Title
Prevention And Suppression Of Contagious Diseases - Hiv/aids
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-24 | House | Meeting postponed (06/24/2019) |
2019-06-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2019-05-31 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/30/2019) |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2019) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/30/2019) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |