RI S0773 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-13 - Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-13 - Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Requires hospitals to adopt, implement, periodically update and submit to the director of health, evidence-based protocols for the early recognition and treatment of patients with sepsis and septic shock.
Title
Sepsis Protocols
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Senate - Sepsis protocols approval of amendment (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2019) |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/11/2019) |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Committee recommended indefinite postponement |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/04/2019) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/30/2019) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |