RI S0773 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the fair employment practices act by clearly establishing that employees of a defendant employer may be individually liable for unfair employment practices.
Title
Unlawful Employment Practices
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] |
Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2017) |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0773.pdf |