RI S0769 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-02 - Referred to House Health & Human Services
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-02 - Referred to House Health & Human Services
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires coverage for residential/inpatient mental health services for detox/stabilization/substance abuse disorders without preauthorization or be subject to concurrent review during the first 28 days.
Title
Comprehensive Discharge Planning
Sponsors
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] |
Sen. Jeanine Calkin [D] | Sen. Samuel Bell [D] | Sen. Meghan Kallman [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | House | Referred to House Health & Human Services |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/01/2021) |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/27/2021) |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Committee recommended indefinite postponement |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/15/2021) |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |