RI S0768 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Meeting postponed (04/29/2021)
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Meeting postponed (04/29/2021)
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that non profit dental service corporations shall have the power to provide for the administering and/or insuring of vision and optometric programs.
Title
Non Profit Dental Service
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | Senate | Meeting postponed (04/29/2021) |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0768.pdf |