RI S0768 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the city council of Warwick to confer upon its municipal court the jurisdiction to apply the provisions of chapter 44 of title 34 regarding abandoned property.
Title
General Powers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-14 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-14 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2017-06-09 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/14/2017) |
2017-05-30 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-05-26 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/30/2017) |
2017-05-05 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/04/2017) |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2017) |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |